Global Patent Index - EP 0991106 A2

EP 0991106 A2 2000-04-05 - High power X-Ray tube

Title (en)

High power X-Ray tube

Title (de)

Hochleistungsröntgenröhre

Title (fr)

Tube à rayons x de haute puissance

Publication

EP 0991106 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99123769 A

Priority

  • EP 91310751 A
  • US 61646490 A

Abstract (en)

A high power x-ray generating tube (2) for reducing the effects of excessive heating of the window (16) through which the x-rays (16) are transmitted. The x-ray generating tube consists of a metal center section (6) having a stationary cathode (8) and a rotating anode (10). Various embodiments are employed for deflecting secondary electrons back scattered from the anode away from the window (16) to avoid overheating of the window. In particular the invention is characterised in that the window (16) includes insulating means for providing a build-up of negative charge on the inner surface of the window to repel secondary electrons (20). A grounded anode simplifies the mechanisms required to prevent overheating.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 35/16; H01J 35/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 35/00 (2006.01); H01J 35/04 (2006.01); H01J 35/14 (2006.01); H01J 35/16 (2006.01); H01J 35/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 35/04 (2013.01); H01J 35/16 (2013.01); H01J 35/18 (2013.01); H01J 2235/122 (2013.01); H01J 2235/1262 (2013.01); H01J 2235/167 (2013.01); H01J 2235/168 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0491471 A2 19920624; EP 0491471 A3 19920930; EP 0991106 A2 20000405; EP 0991106 A3 20000503; JP H04315752 A 19921106

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021015

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020603

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-09-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VARIAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC.

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991221

2000-04-05 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 491471

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB