Global patent index - EP 0991106 A3

EP 0991106 A3 2000-05-03 - High power X-Ray tube

Title (en)

High power X-Ray tube

Title (de)

Hochleistungsröntgenröhre

Title (fr)

Tube à rayons x de haute puissance

Publication

EP 0991106 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99123769 A

Priority

  • EP 91310751 A
  • US 61646490 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0491471A2] A high power x-ray generating tube (2) for reducing the effects of excessive heating of the window (16) through which the x-rays (16) are transmitted. The x-ray generating tube consists of a metal center section (6) having a stationary cathode (8) and a rotating anode (10). Various embodiments are employed for deflecting secondary electrons back scattered from the anode away from the window to avoid overheating of the window. A grounded anode simplifes the mechanisms required to prevent overheating. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 35/16; H01J 35/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 35/00 (2006.01); H01J 35/04 (2006.01); H01J 35/14 (2006.01); H01J 35/16 (2006.01); H01J 35/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 35/04 (2013.01); H01J 35/16 (2013.01); H01J 35/18 (2013.01); H01J 2235/122 (2013.01); H01J 2235/1262 (2013.01); H01J 2235/167 (2013.01); H01J 2235/168 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0491471 A2 19920624; EP 0491471 A3 19920930; EP 0991106 A2 20000405; EP 0991106 A3 20000503; JP H04315752 A 19921106

INPADOC legal status

2003-04-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021015

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020603

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-09-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VARIAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991221

2000-04-05 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 491471

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB