Global Patent Index - EP 0991135 A1

EP 0991135 A1 2000-04-05 - Selective antenna with frequency switching

Title (en)

Selective antenna with frequency switching

Title (de)

Selektive Antenne mit Frequenzumschaltung

Title (fr)

Antenne sélective à commutation en fréquence

Publication

EP 0991135 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402412 A

Priority

FR 9812381 A

Abstract (en)

The slot antenna construction has a radiating antenna (20) with an outer dimension (21) corresponding to a wavelength, etched on a conductor surface (2). Each slot antenna has an electronic mechanism (70a) which has two states. In the first blocked state, the antenna wavelength is unchanged. In the second pass state the wavelength of the slot antenna is modified, changing the operating frequency. the state change is synchronized between antennas, and the radiation patterns remain stable in the two conditions.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une antenne sélective à commutation de fréquence. C'est une antenne à fentes (20) rayonnantes gravées dans une surface conductrice (2) reliée à la masse, les fentes (20) rayonnantes ayant un périmètre (21) correspondant à une longueur radioélectrique donnée, l'antenne comportant des circuits électroniques (70) non linéaires, un circuit électronique (70) étant associé à chaque fente (20) rayonnante et comportant au moins un dispositif électronique (70a) à deux états, un état bloqué qui ne modifie pas la longueur radioélectrique de la fente (20), et un état passant qui diminue la longueur radioélectrique de la fente (20) en raccourcissant le périmètre (21) de la fente (20) par court-circuit réalisé entre deux points (74 et 75) dudit périmètre (21), les circuits électroniques (70) étant synchronisés pour que les fentes (20) rayonnantes présentent entre elles substantiellement la même longueur radioélectrique. L'antenne peut être appliquée à un réseau d'antennes utilisant plusieurs fréquences pour lesquelles les diagrammes de rayonnement des antennes doivent rester sensiblement stables. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 13/10; H01Q 5/00; H01Q 13/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 5/00 (2006.01); H01Q 13/10 (2006.01); H01Q 13/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 9/14 (2013.01); H01Q 13/10 (2013.01); H01Q 13/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] US 5754143 A 19980519 - WARNAGIRIS THOMAS J [US], et al
  • [Y] EP 0487387 A1 19920527 - THOMSON CSF [FR]
  • [A] EP 0250832 A2 19880107 - BALL CORP [US]
  • [A] HISASHI MORISHITA ET AL: "CIRCULARLY-POLARIZED CAVITY-BACKED ANNULAR SLOT ANTENNA WITH ONE POINT SHORTED", IEICE TRANSACTIONS, vol. E74, no. 12, 1 December 1991 (1991-12-01), pages 4096 - 4098, XP000294919
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 283 (E - 1373) 31 May 1993 (1993-05-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 096, no. 002 29 February 1996 (1996-02-29)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0991135 A1 20000405; EP 0991135 B1 20090211; DE 69940393 D1 20090326; ES 2321891 T3 20090612; FR 2784236 A1 20000407; FR 2784236 B1 20060623

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101002

2011-11-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111118

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69940393

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101016

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090923

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091117

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-06-12 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2321891 T3

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69940393 P 20090326

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061228

2001-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THALES

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI