Global Patent Index - EP 0991135 B1

EP 0991135 B1 2009-02-11 - Selective antenna with frequency switching

Title (en)

Selective antenna with frequency switching

Title (de)

Selektive Antenne mit Frequenzumschaltung

Title (fr)

Antenne sélective à commutation en fréquence

Publication

EP 0991135 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402412 A

Priority

FR 9812381 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0991135A1] The slot antenna construction has a radiating antenna (20) with an outer dimension (21) corresponding to a wavelength, etched on a conductor surface (2). Each slot antenna has an electronic mechanism (70a) which has two states. In the first blocked state, the antenna wavelength is unchanged. In the second pass state the wavelength of the slot antenna is modified, changing the operating frequency. the state change is synchronized between antennas, and the radiation patterns remain stable in the two conditions.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 13/10 (2006.01); H01Q 5/00 (2006.01); H01Q 13/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 9/14 (2013.01); H01Q 13/10 (2013.01); H01Q 13/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0991135 A1 20000405; EP 0991135 B1 20090211; DE 69940393 D1 20090326; ES 2321891 T3 20090612; FR 2784236 A1 20000407; FR 2784236 B1 20060623

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161102

2017-07-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170630

2017-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161001

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-09-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101002

2011-11-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111118

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69940393

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101016

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090923

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091117

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-06-12 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2321891 T3

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69940393 P 20090326

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061228

2001-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THALES

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI