Global Patent Index - EP 0991137 A1

EP 0991137 A1 2000-04-05 - Method for expanding the radiation pattern of an antenna and antenna using this method

Title (en)

Method for expanding the radiation pattern of an antenna and antenna using this method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Verbreiterung des Strahlungsdiagramms einer Antenne und Antenne zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé d'élargissement du diagramme de rayonnement d'une antenne, et antenne le mettant en oeuvre

Publication

EP 0991137 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402347 A

Priority

FR 9812155 A

Abstract (en)

The phased array antenna angular extent method switches a circular or elliptical beam from a first (2) inner angular extent to a second (1) outer angular extent following the same contour. The radiation pattern is improved from that previously available by changing the relative phase shift of the outer elements controlling the radiation in the increased radiation zone by a phase shift of 180 degrees.

Abstract (fr)

Pour élargir le diagramme de rayonnement d'une antenne-réseau à balayage électronique à commande de phase, ayant en particulier une ouverture elliptique, on détermine une deuxième ellipse, homothétique de celle de l'ouverture, dans un rapport de 0,84, et les éléments rayonnants se trouvant dans cette deuxième ellipse sont tous alimentés en phase, tandis que les autres sont alimentés avec un déphasage de 180°. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 21/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 21/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 21/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0991137 A1 20000405; FR 2783974 A1 20000331; FR 2783974 B1 20021129

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060401

2001-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THALES

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB IT

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000525

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI