Global Patent Index - EP 0991142 A2

EP 0991142 A2 2000-04-05 - Socket contact element

Title (en)

Socket contact element

Title (de)

Buchsenkontakt

Title (fr)

Elément de contact femelle

Publication

EP 0991142 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99117996 A

Priority

DE 19844863 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a socket contact element (1) for receiving a pin contact element (4) having a small diameter, in particular a contact pin of a PCMCIA plug element, having an elongated, substantially flat lower basic element (5), from which there extends upwards, at the front narrow side, a first spacing element (6) which has an opening (7) for introducing the pin contact element (4) into the socket contact element (1), in which, behind the first spacing element (6) there is formed a spring tongue (8) which presses the pin contact element (4) introduced from below against a contact area (9) which is formed on the first spacing element (6) above the opening (7), and from which a second spacing element (10) extends upwards behind the spring tongue (8). In order to develop such a socket contact element (1) so that greater clamping forces can be exerted on a pin contact element (4) introduced, the invention proposes that the first spacing element (6) has reinforcing elements. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/187

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/11 (2006.01); H01R 13/115 (2006.01); H01R 13/428 (2006.01); H01R 43/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/111 (2013.01); H01R 43/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0991142 A2 20000405; EP 0991142 A3 20000809; DE 19844863 A1 20000420; DE 19844863 C2 20030130; JP 2000106240 A 20000411

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051108

2005-08-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050627

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR GB IT NL SE

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000919

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT NL SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI