Global patent index - EP 0991149 A2

EP 0991149 A2 2000-04-05 - Plug part of an electric plug connector for high frequency data transmission over electrical conductors

Title (en)

Plug part of an electric plug connector for high frequency data transmission over electrical conductors

Title (de)

Steckverbindungsteil für hochfrequente Datenübertragung über elektrische Leiter

Title (fr)

Partie de connecteur électrique à fiches pour la transmission de données a hautefréquence sur des conducteurs électriques

Publication

EP 0991149 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118824 A

Priority

CH 198998 A

Abstract (en)

The plug connector part has contacts connected to the separated ends of the twisted pair cables for reversible connection to corresponding contacts in a complementary part in the plug connector. The separated cables of the twisted wire pairs are fed directly in the cable outlet region, in a defined sequence, in parallel. This is in two planes and at a defined distance apart into a non-conducting contact housing (11) that can be installed in the contact plug. Here the cables are connected to the contacts (1' to 8') via insulation removal contact elements (9).

Abstract (de)

Beim Kontaktestecker einer Steckverbindung für hochfrequente Datenübertragung über mehrere verdrillte elektrische Leiterpaare eines Kabels, sind Leiter am Kabelende durch Auflösung der Verdrillung vereinzelt und über Drahtanschlussmittel an Kontakten angeschlossen. Hierbei sind die vereinzelten Leiter der Leiterpaare unmittelbar im Kabelaustrittsbereich in vorgegebener Reihenfolge parallel und in zwei Ebenen sowie mit vorgegebenem Abstand zueinander in einem in den Kontaktstecker einbaubaren Kontaktgehäuse (11) aus nichtleitendem Material geführt und dort je über vorzugsweise eine Schneidklemme (9') an einem Schneidklemm-(IDC)-Kontaktelement (9) mit den betreffenden Kontakten (1' bis 8') aufgeschaltet. Durch diese Massnahmen werden nunmehr bei einem solchen Hochfrequenzstecker sowohl elektrische (kapazitive) als auch magnetische (induktive) Übersprechkopplungen optimal reduziert, wobei hier insbesondere eine Nebensprechunterdrückung erreicht wird durch eine kürzeste Auflösestrecke der Verdrillung der Leiterpaare, durch Parallelführung der vereinzelten Leiter auf kürzester Strecke ohne Auskreuzung in zwei Ebenen und so mit grossem Leiterabstand und durch Vermeidung von als Kondensator wirksamen Piercing-Kontakten. Zudem gestattet die erfindungsgemässe Anordnung ein leichtes, maschinell mögliches Aufschalten der einzelnen Leiter und einen problemlosen Einbau in einen genormten RJ 45 - Hochfrequenzstecker. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/24; H01R 13/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 24/00 (2006.01); H01R 24/64 (2011.01); H01R 13/6464 (2011.01); H01R 107/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/2429 (2013.01); H01R 24/64 (2013.01); H01R 13/6464 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0991149 A2 20000405; EP 0991149 A3 20010502; EP 0991149 B1 20040825; CH 695034 A5 20051115; CN 1205696 C 20050608; CN 1252633 A 20000510; DE 59910330 D1 20040930; JP 2000113941 A 20000421; TW 424353 B 20010301; US 2001044232 A1 20011122

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-06-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59910330

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: DAUB UND KOLLEGEN, DE

2012-06-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59910330

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENT- UND RECHTSANWALTSKANZLEI DAUB, DE

2005-08-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050526

2005-05-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-10-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2004-09-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910330

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-08-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01R 4/24 A

2004-02-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01R 13/46 B

2002-08-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 4/24 A, 7H 01R 13/46 B

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011102

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 24/04 A, 7H 01R 24/00 B, 7H 01R 4/24 B, 7H 01R 13/46 B

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI