Global patent index - EP 0991151 A2

EP 0991151 A2 2000-04-05 - Contact element to connect a flat cable to round conductors and rotary connector with such contact

Title (en)

Contact element to connect a flat cable to round conductors and rotary connector with such contact

Title (de)

Kontaktelement zur Verbindung einer Flachbandleitung mit Rundleitern und Drehverbinder mit einem derartigen Kontaktelement

Title (fr)

Element de contact pour connecter un câble plat avec des conducteurs ronds et connecteur rotatif avec tel élément

Publication

EP 0991151 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99402248 A

Priority

DE 19844869 A

Abstract (en)

The contact element has several mutually isolated, parallel conductor strips (20) of conducting material. Round cable can be attached to one end of the strips and the other end (21) has a surface to which one wire of the flat strip cable can be attached. A conductor strip has at least one pair of cutting edges (29), between which a round cable can be inserted and clamped. An Independent claim is also included for a rotary connector with a connecting element.

Abstract (de)

Vorgeschlagen wird ein Kontaktelement zur Verbindung einer Flachbandleitung (10) mit Rundleitern (5, 7), wobei das Kontaktelement mehrere gegeneinander isolierte, parallele Leiterstreifen (20) aus leitfähigem Material umfaßt, an deren einem Ende ein Rundleiter (5, 7) anbringbar ist und deren anderes Ende eine Fläche (21) aufweist, an der eine Ader der Flachbandleitung (10) stoffschlüssig fixierbar ist, wobei ein Leiterstreifen (20) mindestens ein Paar von Schneiden (29) aufweist, zwischen die ein Rundleiter (5,7) unter Klemmung einschiebbar ist. Ferner ist ein Drehverbinder mit einem derartigen Kontaktelement beschrieben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 35/02; H01R 4/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 12/59 (2011.01); H01R 35/00 (2006.01); H01R 35/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/2454 (2013.01); H01R 12/592 (2013.01); H01R 35/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0991151 A2 20000405; EP 0991151 A3 20000531; DE 19844869 A1 20000511; US 6325657 B1 20011204

INPADOC legal status

2005-11-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20050909

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEXANS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT NL SE

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-06-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 12/38 A, 7H 01R 35/02 B, 7H 01R 4/24 B, 7H 01R 35/04 B

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI