Global Patent Index - EP 0991168 A3

EP 0991168 A3 2001-03-21 - Eddy current reduction apparatus

Title (en)

Eddy current reduction apparatus

Title (de)

Wirbelstrom-Bremsgerät

Title (fr)

Ralentisseur à courant de Foucault

Publication

EP 0991168 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99119212 A

Priority

JP 27732998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0991168A2] A guide tube 10 formed of a non-magnetic material and having a hollow portion in the shape of a rectangle in section is disposed interiorly of a brake drum 7 connected to a rotational shaft 1. A number of ferromagnetic plates 15 are connected at peripherally equal intervals on an outer tubular portion 10a of the guide tube 10. Magnets 24 and 24A are connected to outer peripheral surfaces of a movable magnet support tube 14 and an immovable magnet support tube 14A repectively so that their polarities opposed to the ferromagnetic plates 15 are peripherally alternately different. The magnet support tubes 14 and 14A are disposed in the hollow portion of the guide tube 10. An area of an outer surface 50a of the ferromagnetic plate 15 is made to be narrower than that of an inner surface 50b thereof, and the outer surface 50a is biased forward in a rotational direction of the brake drum 7 from the inner surface 50b. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02K 49/04; B60L 7/28; H02K 49/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60L 7/28 (2006.01); F16D 61/00 (2006.01); H02K 49/02 (2006.01); H02K 49/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02K 49/043 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0828339 A2 19980311 - ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 18, no. 263 (E - 1550) 19 May 1994 (1994-05-19)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 2 31 March 1995 (1995-03-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 1 31 January 1996 (1996-01-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0991168 A2 20000405; EP 0991168 A3 20010321; EP 0991168 B1 20031203; DE 69913281 D1 20040115; DE 69913281 T2 20040930; JP 2000116108 A 20000421; US 6209688 B1 20010403

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040928

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-09-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040928

2004-08-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69913281

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010424

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 02K 49/04 A, 7H 02K 49/02 B, 7B 60L 7/28 B

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI