Global Patent Index - EP 0991295 A2

EP 0991295 A2 2000-04-05 - Speaker and speaker device

Title (en)

Speaker and speaker device

Title (de)

Lautsprecher und Lautsprechergerät

Title (fr)

Haut-parleur et dispossitif à haut-parleur

Publication

EP 0991295 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99402359 A

Priority

JP 27302898 A

Abstract (en)

A speaker has a very small size and is arranged to emit sound waves in a non-directional manner. The speaker includes a case (12) and a speaker unit (16) attached to a plate (14) provided at an opening of the case (12). The speaker is arranged so that the speaker unit (16) is mounted or attached to a floor or support surface such that a space formed by the case (12), the plate (14) and the speaker unit (16) is airtight and so that the back-and-forth motion of a vibrator of the speaker unit (16) generates expansion and contraction of the case (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/00 (2006.01); H04R 1/02 (2006.01); H03F 3/181 (2006.01); H04R 1/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/2834 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0991295 A2 20000405; EP 0991295 A3 20060719; JP 2000102082 A 20000407

INPADOC legal status


2009-05-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081115

2008-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080704

2007-11-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.

2007-06-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2007-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2006-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2006-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04R 1/02 20060101AFI20000112BHEP

2006-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04R 1/28 20060101ALI20060321BHEP

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991008

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI