Global Patent Index - EP 0991300 A2

EP 0991300 A2 2000-04-05 - Positive temperature coefficient heater and production method thereof

Title (en)

Positive temperature coefficient heater and production method thereof

Title (de)

PTC Heizelement und Verfahren zur Herstellung

Title (fr)

Elément PTC et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 0991300 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99305382 A

Priority

KR 19980041477 A

Abstract (en)

A positive temperature coefficient heater produced by protecting the form of a definite pattern on an insulator having an aluminum thin film using an etching resist, after etching the portions unprotected with the above-described etching resist using an etching agent, removing the etching resist and the etching agent, and further printing a definite form using a carbon paste to connect electrode terminals to aluminum electrode layer in parallel. In the positive temperature coefficient heater of the present invention, as compared with using a conventional silver paste, there is almost no deviation of temperature, the production cost is greatly reduced, and further the production step is simplified, whereby when the positive temperature coefficient heater is attached to the inside of a side mirror of a motorcar, an excellent effect is shown in the removal of fogging, ice, etc. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/26; H05B 3/28; H05B 3/84

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/20 (2006.01); H05B 3/10 (2006.01); H05B 3/14 (2006.01); H05B 3/26 (2006.01); H05B 3/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/845 (2013.01); H05B 2203/013 (2013.01); H05B 2203/017 (2013.01); H05B 2203/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0991300 A2 20000405; EP 0991300 A3 20020116; EP 0991300 B1 20050928; CN 1250347 A 20000412; DE 69927455 D1 20060209; DE 69927455 T2 20060720; ES 2251156 T3 20060416; JP 2000164328 A 20000616

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160728

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160718

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-09-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060629

2006-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2251156 T3

2006-02-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69927455 P 20060209

2005-12-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2005-11-30 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SUNTECH CO., LTD

2005-09-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2005-09-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-09-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050928

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030711

2003-01-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-11-07 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 05B 3/26 A, 7H 05B 3/28 B, 7H 05B 3/84 B, 7H 05B 3/00 B, 7C 23F 1/20 B

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI