Global Patent Index - EP 0991334 A1

EP 0991334 A1 2000-04-12 - SHOE WITH DEFORMABLE SOLE STRUCTURE

Title (en)

SHOE WITH DEFORMABLE SOLE STRUCTURE

Title (de)

SCHUH MIT VERFORMBARER BESOHLUNG

Title (fr)

CHAUSSURE A SEMELAGE AVEC STRUCTURE DEFORMABLE

Publication

EP 0991334 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99915801 A

Priority

  • FR 9900895 W
  • FR 9805216 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2777429A1] The shoe sole (10) is made from two superimposed layers, a wear layer (11) and a nerve layer (12). The nerve layer has a flexible structure (17) inside a frame (20). The structure is made from a transverse cavity (18) which determines between its two ends (18') the contour of a tongue (21) with its axis in the longitudinal direction of the nerve layer. The sole longitudinal flexibility is reinforced by the tongue and can deform transversely in its central zone (16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 13/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 13/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 13/10 (2013.01); A43B 13/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9953787A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2777429 A1 19991022; FR 2777429 B1 20000526; AT 240665 T 20030615; DE 69908056 D1 20030626; DE 69908056 T2 20031127; EP 0991334 A1 20000412; EP 0991334 B1 20030521; JP 2002505611 A 20020219; JP 3973053 B2 20070905; US 6321469 B1 20011127; WO 9953787 A1 19991028

INPADOC legal status


2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140416

2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140416

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-29 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69908056

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141231

2014-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 240665 T

- Effective date: 20140416

2014-11-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69908056

2014-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130417

2013-12-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130625

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130423

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130508

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130412

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120411

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-02-26 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2010-02-26 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2010-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SALOMON S.A.S.

- Free text: SALOMON S.A.#LIEUDIT "LA RAVOIRE"#74370 METZ-TESSY (FR) -TRANSFER TO- SALOMON S.A.S.#LES CROISELETS#74370 METZ-TESSY (FR)

2004-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040224

2003-09-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69908056 P 20030626

2003-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI SE

2002-07-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020528

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991108

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI SE