Global Patent Index - EP 0991345 A1

EP 0991345 A1 2000-04-12 - UPHOLSTERY OR SUPPORT WITH EXPANSIBLE CELLS

Title (en)

UPHOLSTERY OR SUPPORT WITH EXPANSIBLE CELLS

Title (de)

POLSTERUNG ODER STÜTZE MIT EXPANDIERBAREN ZELLEN

Title (fr)

REMBOURRAGE OU SUPPORT A CELLULES EXPANSIBLES

Publication

EP 0991345 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 97930565 A

Priority

FR 9701112 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9858571A1] The invention concerns a support or upholstery comprising expansible cells whereof the inoperative cell body in transverse cross-section is individually delimited by at least two concentric perimeters, the inoperative cell walls joining each of the perimeters are characterised in that the cell wall portion joining two points each located on one of the concentric perimeters (6 and 7) can be strictly in a straight line on its centripetal travel, if between two other points (28) at the opening of the successive chinks, slots or breaks (4) located on the outer perimeter the path followed takes on at least over a certain length the aspect of a strictly straight line or flat surface (29); one of the two last points (28) being the same as the first located on the outer perimeter (7) at the junction or exit of a chink; all the points constituting this flat surface (29) being more distant or distal relative to the cell centre (24) than the other points, outside the flat surface (29), constituting the cover (7) on its travel between two points (28) located at the successive chink (4) junction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 27/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/00 (2006.01); A47C 27/08 (2006.01); A47C 27/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/081 (2013.01); A47C 27/10 (2013.01); Y10S 5/944 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9858571A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9858571 A1 19981230; DE 69715469 D1 20021017; DE 69715469 T2 20030724; EP 0991345 A1 20000412; EP 0991345 B1 20020911; JP 2002503136 A 20020129; US 2002013967 A1 20020207; US 2003131417 A1 20030717; US 6550085 B2 20030422; US 6684430 B2 20040203

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160229

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140731

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110623

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-04-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69715469

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-02-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110623

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101118

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100630

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-01-30 [PGRI DE] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Effective date: 20080923

2008-10-31 [PGRI FR] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Effective date: 20070913

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080102

2007-10-19 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

2007-08-24 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070228

2006-05-12 [REG FR D3] DECISION TO REVOKE THE DECISION OF LAPSE

2006-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060228

2004-09-10 [REG FR D3] DECISION TO REVOKE THE DECISION OF LAPSE

2004-05-14 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-01-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030108

2002-12-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715469 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000120

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE