Global patent index - EP 0991350 A1

EP 0991350 A1 2000-04-12 - MICROWAVE BROWNING OF VEGETABLES

Title (en)

MICROWAVE BROWNING OF VEGETABLES

Title (de)

BRÄUNEN VON GEMÜSE MITTELS MIKROWELLE

Title (fr)

BRUNISSEMENT DE LEGUMES AUX MICRO-ONDES

Publication

EP 0991350 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98920405 A

Priority

  • AU 9800361 W
  • AU PO687197 A
  • AU PP152298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9852446A1] A method for the microwave irradiation of a vegetable to cook the same and to brown the exterior thereof includes the steps of applying a microwave activated browning agent to the surface of the vegetable; prior to irradiation, positioning a shielding means adjacent to the vegetable in a location such that, during irradiation, adjacent portions of the vegetable are shielded from microwave radiation; and irradiating the vegetable with microwave radiation to cook and brown the same.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47J 27/00; B65D 81/34; A23L 1/025

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23L 1/00 (2006.01); A23L 1/01 (2006.01); A23L 1/212 (2006.01); A23L 1/275 (2006.01); A23P 1/08 (2006.01); B65D 81/34 (2006.01); H05B 6/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/6494 (2013.01); A23L 5/15 (2016.08); A23L 5/19 (2016.08); A23L 5/48 (2016.08); A23L 19/05 (2016.08); A23P 20/10 (2016.08); B65D 81/3453 (2013.01); B65D 2581/3427 (2013.01); B65D 2581/345 (2013.01); B65D 2581/3455 (2013.01); B65D 2581/3472 (2013.01); B65D 2581/3483 (2013.01); B65D 2581/3489 (2013.01); B65D 2581/3494 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9852446 A1 19981126; AR 015689 A1 20010516; EP 0991350 A1 20000412; EP 0991350 A4 20010425; EP 0991350 B1 20050504; IN 185348 B 20001230; MY 117405 A 20040630; PE 87999 A1 19990921; TW 491691 B 20020621; US 6682764 B1 20040127

INPADOC legal status

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100518

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-04-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100518

2011-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-02 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100518

2010-12-08 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20101201

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090513

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090514

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090515

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090521

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090504

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-04-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060207

2006-03-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69830055

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-06-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-06-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-05-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT NL

2005-05-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-05-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050504

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030408

2001-04-25 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010313

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT NL

2001-04-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47J 27/00 A, 7B 65D 81/34 B, 7A 23L 1/025 B, 7A 23L 1/01 B, 7A 23L 1/212 B, 7A 23L 1/275 B, 7A 23P 1/08 B

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991220

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT NL