Global patent index - EP 0991355 A1

EP 0991355 A1 2000-04-12 - FLOOR MOP

Title (en)

FLOOR MOP

Title (de)

FUSSBODENWISCHGERÄT

Title (fr)

BALAI LAVEUR

Publication

EP 0991355 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98917385 A

Priority

  • GB 9801114 W
  • GB 9713685 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9900050A1] This invention relates to the field of floor cleaning and floor treatment, and in particular relates to such activities carried out with use of a mop. Mops need to be frequently rinsed and charged with cleaning fluid and then pressed or wrung to remove excess fluid. The present application discloses a sieving arrangement for removing fluid from a mop comprising a mop stick (32) connected at a lower end thereof to a mop head (34), which sieving arrangement comprises a sieving surface against which the mop head may be pressed for removal of fluid and mop stick engagement means (35) configured and disposed to permit pivoting of the mop stick thereabout, the arrangement being such that a user may apply pressure against an upper end region of the mop stick in order to lever the mop head about said mop stick engagement means and against said sieving surface for the discharge of excess fluid in the mop head.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 13/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 13/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 13/58 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9900050A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9900050 A1 19990107; AU 7062598 A 19990119; DE 69809233 D1 20021212; DE 69809233 T2 20030911; EP 0991355 A1 20000412; EP 0991355 B1 20021106; GB 9713685 D0 19970903

INPADOC legal status

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080416

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080416

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070416

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070430

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060410

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-02-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030206

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69809233

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-12

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK GB

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991229

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK GB