Global patent index - EP 0991387 A1

EP 0991387 A1 2000-04-12 - TRIDIMENSIONAL DISPOSABLE ABSORBENT ARTICLE HAVING A SLIT IN THE REAR REGION

Title (en)

TRIDIMENSIONAL DISPOSABLE ABSORBENT ARTICLE HAVING A SLIT IN THE REAR REGION

Title (de)

DREIDIMENSIONALER ABSORBIERENDER WEGWERFARTIKEL MIT SCHLITZ IN DEM HINTEREN BEREICH

Title (fr)

ARTICLE ABSORBANT JETABLE TRIDIMENSIONNEL POURVU D'UNE ENTAILLE DANS LA REGION POSTERIEURE

Publication

EP 0991387 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98925895 A

Priority

  • EP 98925895 A
  • EP 97110734 A
  • EP 97110735 A
  • EP 97122739 A
  • IB 9801009 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0888765A1] A tridimensional disposable absorbent article having a tridimensional shape prior to use with a generally upwardly convex rear region, having a body facing surface and a garment facing surface, a longitudinal symmetry plane, a front end edge and a rear end edge, and comprising a liquid pervious topsheet, a backsheet joined to said topsheet and an absorbent core intermediate the backsheet and the topsheet. The absorbent article comprises a cut or slit in the rear region that allows the cut portions of the article to move apart during the use, therefore providing enhanced fit to the body and better conformability to the wearer's anatomy, particularly in the rear region. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 13/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/00 (2006.01); A61F 13/15 (2006.01); A61F 13/472 (2006.01); A61F 13/514 (2006.01); A61F 13/56 (2006.01); A61F 13/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/47227 (2013.01); A61F 13/47263 (2013.01); A61F 13/4758 (2013.01); A61F 13/5611 (2013.01); A61F 13/82 (2013.01); A61F 13/84 (2013.01); A61F 2013/455 (2013.01); A61F 2013/4568 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9901097A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0888765 A1 19990107; AR 016301 A1 20010704; AU 738092 B2 20010906; AU 7785298 A 19990125; BR 9810528 A 20000829; CA 2295742 A1 19990114; CN 1268043 A 20000927; EP 0991387 A1 20000412; HU 0004466 A2 20010428; HU 0004466 A3 20010528; IL 133802 D0 20010430; JP 2001509405 A 20010724; KR 20010014435 A 20010226; NO 996585 A 20000228; NO 996585 D0 19991230; PE 102099 A1 19991208; TR 200000306 T2 20000821; WO 9901097 A1 19990114

INPADOC legal status

2007-02-09 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1028176

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2002-05-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011113

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010430

2000-11-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000131

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE