Global Patent Index - EP 0991473 A1

EP 0991473 A1 2000-04-12 - FEED SENSOR MECHANISM

Title (en)

FEED SENSOR MECHANISM

Title (de)

SPEISESENSORIK

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE DETECTEURS POUR OPERATIONS D'ALIMENTATION

Publication

EP 0991473 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98907803 A

Priority

  • CH 9800116 W
  • DE 19726551 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19726551A1] The invention relates to a feed sensor mechanism for a mill cylinder (1), especially a 4 or 8-cylinder mill of the type used in a mill for grinding cereals. The aim of the invention is to provide a structurally simple means of detecting the product in the entry part of the feed regulator. To this end, a sensor (8) is located in the feed cylinder (2) of the cylinder mill (1). Said sensor is able to detect the weight (F) of the incoming product so that a control signal can then be sent to the feed device via a signal converter (9).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 4/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 25/00 (2006.01); B02C 4/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 4/286 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9858738A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19726551 A1 19981224; AT 209527 T 20011215; CN 1128021 C 20031119; CN 1261295 A 20000726; CZ 295271 B6 20050615; CZ 9903875 A3 20000412; DE 59802255 D1 20020110; EP 0991473 A1 20000412; EP 0991473 B1 20011128; ES 2167066 T3 20020501; HK 1027059 A1 20040903; HU 0002665 A2 20001228; HU 0002665 A3 20010928; HU 222036 B1 20030328; JP 2002504854 A 20020212; JP 4694658 B2 20110608; PL 192373 B1 20061031; PL 337574 A1 20000828; RU 2223148 C2 20040210; TR 9903235 T2 20000721; US 6502773 B1 20030107; WO 9858738 A1 19981230; ZA 9804653 B 19990128

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-10-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BUHLER A.G.

- Effective date: 20100331

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090429

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090310

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-11-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2167066 T3

2002-03-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802255 20020110

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 209527 T 20011215

2001-05-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000907

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990812

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL