Global Patent Index - EP 0991483 B1

EP 0991483 B1 2002-12-04 - APPLICATION OF PLASTIC ON INDIVIDUAL METAL PARTS

Title (en)

APPLICATION OF PLASTIC ON INDIVIDUAL METAL PARTS

Title (de)

AUFBRINGEN VON KUNSTSTOFF AUF METALLISCHE EINZELTEILE

Title (fr)

APPLICATION DE MATIERES PLASTIQUES SUR DES PIECES METALLIQUES INDIVIDUELLES

Publication

EP 0991483 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98936350 A

Priority

  • DE 19725780 A
  • EP 9803617 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19725780A1] The invention relates to a method for applying plastic or plastic coatings to metal parts. Said method consists of the following steps: a) the individual parts are brought into contact with a solution or dispersion containing 5 to 50 wt. % organic polymer; b) the solution or dispersion is dried; c) the individual parts are brought into contact with a qualitatively substantially identical solution or dispersion according to step a), containing, however, 0.5 to 5 wt. % organic polymer, and d) finally dried. Preferably, the solution or dispersion contains a chrome VI or chrome III compound and or adhesion-promoting pigments, flow-control agents and/or defoamers (additives). Other preferred embodiments of the invention consist in brining the individual parts into contact with a solution or dispersion having a temperature of 5 to 40 DEG C, drying as in step b) at a temperature ranging from 40 to 60 DEG C and final drying in step d) at a high temperature of up to 200 DEG C. The main advantage of the invention is that the method can be used in the pre-treatment of individual parts before powder coating.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 1/38; B05D 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 7/542 (2013.01); B05D 7/544 (2013.01); B05D 7/587 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19725780 A1 19981224; CN 1134311 C 20040114; CN 1261296 A 20000726; EP 0991483 A1 20000412; EP 0991483 B1 20021204; TW 446581 B 20010721; US 6299943 B1 20011009; WO 9857759 A1 19981223

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-16 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59806549

2018-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170630

2018-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170616

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170616

2018-03-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180228

2018-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170616

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170608

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CHEMETALL G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-08-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030627

2003-06-16 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030616

2003-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-04-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030306

2003-03-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030304

2003-03-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030304

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806549 20030116

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2002-12-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020321

2000-11-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHEMETALL GMBH

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000118

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE