Global Patent Index - EP 0991521 A1

EP 0991521 A1 2000-04-12 - INK JET PRINTER WITH A NOZZLE COVERING AND CLEANING DEVICE

Title (en)

INK JET PRINTER WITH A NOZZLE COVERING AND CLEANING DEVICE

Title (de)

TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKER MIT EINER DÜSENABDECKUNGS- UND -REINIGUNGSEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

IMPRIMANTE A JET D'ENCRE POURVUE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE RECOUVREMENT ET D'UN DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE POUR LES BUSES A ENCRE

Publication

EP 0991521 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98919075 A

Priority

  • DE 9800890 W
  • DE 19726971 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19726971C1] The invention relates to an ink jet printer (10), comprising a printing head (18) which can be displaced parallel to a print line, a print backing support (14, 14', 14") used to support a printing medium (30), and a covering device (24) and cleaning device (26) for the ink nozzles of the printing head (18). The covering device (24), the cleaning device (26) and a supporting section (28) for the printing medium (30) are arranged on a rotating disk (20) within the printing area of the printing head (18).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/165

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/165 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/16511 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9900253A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19726971 C1 19981217; EP 0991521 A1 20000412; EP 0991521 B1 20010606; ES 2158682 T3 20010901; JP 2003520562 A 20030702; US 6361141 B1 20020326; WO 9900253 A1 19990107

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800826

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090326

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100531

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090326

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090326

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080328

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080329

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080318

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-12-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030327

2004-03-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-11-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030327

2002-05-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020328

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-03-05 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020305

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010817

2001-09-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158682 T3

2001-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800826 20010712

2001-06-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ALTHOFF PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2001-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000926

2000-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WINCOR NIXDORF GMBH & CO KG

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991217

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI