Global Patent Index - EP 0991523 A1

EP 0991523 A1 2000-04-12 - PLASTICS WHICH CAN BE LASER-MARKED

Title (en)

PLASTICS WHICH CAN BE LASER-MARKED

Title (de)

LASERMARKIERBARE KUNSTSTOFFE

Title (fr)

PLASTIQUES PERMETTANT LE MARQUAGE AU LASER

Publication

EP 0991523 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98929407 A

Priority

  • DE 19726136 A
  • EP 9803250 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19726136A1] The invention relates to plastics which can be marked by laser, characterised in that an absorber material in the form of a plastic which is not receptive to laser treatment contains a polymer whose intrinsic properties are such that it can be marked by laser. Said polymer is present in the form of micro-ground particles with a particle size of between 0.1 and 100 mu m.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/36; B41M 5/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/26 (2006.01); B41M 5/36 (2006.01); C08J 7/00 (2006.01); C08L 101/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/267 (2013.01); B41M 5/366 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9858805A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FI FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19726136 A1 19981224; AU 7917898 A 19990104; BR 9810065 A 20000919; CA 2294235 A1 19981230; CN 1169677 C 20041006; CN 1260752 A 20000719; DE 19880779 D2 20000907; EP 0991523 A1 20000412; EP 0991523 B1 20021016; ES 2183381 T3 20030316; JP 2002504947 A 20020212; KR 20010013893 A 20010226; TW 589339 B 20040601; WO 9858805 A1 19981230

INPADOC legal status


2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090529

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-03-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050530

2005-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050530

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030531

2004-05-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040526

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040510

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183381 T3

2003-02-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030116

2002-11-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805984 20021121

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT

2002-10-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-16 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021016

2002-10-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021016

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010110

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991124

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT