Global patent index - EP 0991526 A1

EP 0991526 A1 2000-04-12 - DEVICE FOR PLACING A LIQUID ON A SUBSTRATE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR PLACING A LIQUID ON A SUBSTRATE

Title (de)

GERÄT ZUM AUFBRINGEN EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT AUF EINE UNTERLAGE

Title (fr)

APPAREIL POUR APPLIQUER UN LIQUIDE SUR UN SUBSTRAT

Publication

EP 0991526 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98938638 A

Priority

  • DE 19727485 A
  • EP 9803856 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19727485A1] The invention relates to a device for placing a liquid con a substrate. The inventive device comprises a housing (2) with a liquid receptacle (52), an applicator (30) protruding from the housing, a pump chamber (54) which is connected to the liquid receptacle via a first valve (21) which opens when there is an underpressure in the pump chamber and which is connected to the applicator via a second valve (29), in addition to an actuator (44; 56) with which the volume of the pump chamber can be reduced counter to the force of a spring device (40; 58; 84), wherein the second valve opens in the direction of a reduction in the pump chamber when an actuating element is operated. The invention is characterized in that the valve openings (12, 26; 74, 76) of the first and second valve are arranged on separating walls (4, 6; 66, 68) rigidly connected to the housing, in that the second valve (29; 89) is opened by an overpressure in the pump chamber (54; 82) and in that the wall of the pump chamber (54; 82) is hermetically sealed outwards with the exception of the valves (21, 29; 87, 89).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B43K 5/18; A45D 34/04; B05B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 34/04 (2006.01); B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B43K 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/3032 (2013.01); A45D 34/042 (2013.01); B43K 5/1836 (2013.01); B05B 11/0048 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9900257A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19727485 A1 19990107; EP 0991526 A1 20000412; EP 0991526 B1 20020220; WO 9900257 A1 19990107

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-02-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021121

2002-11-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2002-08-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20020220

2002-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803139

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-03-28

2002-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-02-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020220

2002-02-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020220

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001030

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991213

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB