Global Patent Index - EP 0991605 A1

EP 0991605 A1 2000-04-12 - AQUEOUS SUSPENSIONS OF METAKAOLIN AND A METHOD OF PRODUCING CEMENTITIOUS COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

AQUEOUS SUSPENSIONS OF METAKAOLIN AND A METHOD OF PRODUCING CEMENTITIOUS COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

WÄSSRIGE, METAKAOLIN-HALTIGE SUSPENSIONEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG ZEMENTHALTIGER ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN

Title (fr)

SUSPENSIONS AQUEUSES DE METAKAOLIN ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE COMPOSITIONS CIMENTAIRES

Publication

EP 0991605 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98932268 A

Priority

  • GB 9801758 W
  • GB 9712479 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9857905A1] An aqueous suspension suitable for use in the production of cementitious compositions which includes, prior to production of a cementitious composition, an aqueous medium and a particulate inorganic material suspended in the aqueous medium, the particulate inorganic material comprising metakaolin and being substantially lime-free and having a pozzolanic activity, the suspension having a Ph of at least 7.5, the suspension being in a stable form having a rheology which allows it to be flowable as a wet slurry and wherein the suspension includes a thickening agent which inhibits sedimentation of the inorganic particulate material in the suspension.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C04B 28/04; C04B 14/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C04B 14/10 (2006.01); C04B 28/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C04B 14/106 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9857905A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9857905 A1 19981223; AU 8222498 A 19990104; CA 2294372 A1 19981223; CN 1260769 A 20000719; EP 0991605 A1 20000412; GB 9712479 D0 19970820; JP 2002504882 A 20020212; NO 996245 A 20000211; NO 996245 D0 19991216; ZA 9805252 B 19990218

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010616

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010205

2000-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: IMERYS MINERALS LIMITED

2000-07-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: IMERYS MINERALS LIMITED

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000108

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT