Global Patent Index - EP 0991648 A1

EP 0991648 A1 2000-04-12 - 4-HALOALKYL-3- HETEROCYCLYLPYRIDINES AND 4-HALOALKYL -5-HETEROCYCLYLPYRIDINES, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, AGENTS CONTAINING THE SAME AND THEIR USE AS PESTICIDES

Title (en)

4-HALOALKYL-3- HETEROCYCLYLPYRIDINES AND 4-HALOALKYL -5-HETEROCYCLYLPYRIDINES, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, AGENTS CONTAINING THE SAME AND THEIR USE AS PESTICIDES

Title (de)

4-HALOALKYL-3-HETEROCYCLYLPYRIDINE UND 4-HALOALKYL-5-HETEROCYCLYLPYRIMIDINE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG, SIE ENTHALTENDE MITTEL UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS SCHÄDLINGSBEKÄMPFUNGSMITTEL

Title (fr)

4-HALOALKYL-3- HETEROCYCLYLPYRIDINES ET 4-HALOALKYL -5-HETEROCYCLYLPYRIMIDINES, LEURS PROCEDES DE PREPARATION, PRODUITS LES CONTENANT ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME PESTICIDES

Publication

EP 0991648 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98937442 A

Priority

  • DE 19725450 A
  • EP 9803321 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19725450A1] The invention relates to 4-haloalkyl-3-heterocyclylpyridines and 4-haloalkyl-5-heterocyclylpyridines of general formula (I), to a method for the production thereof, to agents containing the same and to the use of said compounds to control animal pests, specially insects, mites, ectoparasites and helminths. In general formula (I), Q stands for a 5-atom heterocyclic group optionally substituted by organic radicals, Y stands for halogen-C1-C6-alkyl, X represents CH or N and m means 0 or 1.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 413/04; A01N 43/54; A01N 43/647; A01N 43/82; C07D 401/04; C07D 413/14; C07D 417/04; C07D 417/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 43/76 (2006.01); A01N 43/82 (2006.01); A01N 43/836 (2006.01); A61K 31/4439 (2006.01); A61K 31/506 (2006.01); A61P 33/00 (2006.01); C07D 401/04 (2006.01); C07D 413/04 (2006.01); C07D 413/14 (2006.01); C07D 417/04 (2006.01); C07D 417/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 401/04 (2013.01); A01N 43/76 (2013.01); A01N 43/82 (2013.01); C07D 413/04 (2013.01); C07D 413/14 (2013.01); C07D 417/04 (2013.01); C07D 417/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9857969A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19725450 A1 19981217; AP 9901716 D0 19991231; AR 014102 A1 20010207; AU 754182 B2 20021107; AU 8624398 A 19990104; BR 9810139 A 20000808; CA 2294888 A1 19981223; CN 1102149 C 20030226; CN 1260793 A 20000719; CO 5040002 A1 20010529; EP 0991648 A1 20000412; HU 0002729 A2 20001128; HU 0002729 A3 20010228; ID 26589 A 20010118; IL 133531 D0 20010430; JP 2002504127 A 20020205; NZ 501792 A 20020328; PL 337695 A1 20000828; TR 9903102 T2 20000421; US 2002013326 A1 20020131; US 6239160 B1 20010529; US 6521610 B2 20030218; WO 9857969 A1 19981223; ZA 9805180 B 19981217

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080103

2007-05-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030925

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CROPSCIENCE GMBH

2000-09-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE GMBH

2000-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TIEBES, JOERG

2000-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TAAPKEN, THOMAS

2000-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROOK, BURKHARD

2000-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KERN, MANFRED

2000-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SANFT, ULRICH

2000-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE GMBH

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000117

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT