Global Patent Index - EP 0991692 A1

EP 0991692 A1 2000-04-12 - NOVEL MONOMERS WITH DILACTONIC CYCLE, AND CORRESPONDING POLYMERS

Title (en)

NOVEL MONOMERS WITH DILACTONIC CYCLE, AND CORRESPONDING POLYMERS

Title (de)

MONOMERE MIT DILACTONRING UND POLYMERE DARAUS

Title (fr)

NOUVEAUX MONOMERES A CYCLE DILACTONIQUE, ET POLYMERES CORRESPONDANTS

Publication

EP 0991692 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98933753 A

Priority

  • FR 9801386 W
  • FR 9708145 A
  • FR 9708146 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6156429A] PCT No. PCT/FR98/01386 Sec. 371 Date Mar. 21, 2000 Sec. 102(e) Date Mar. 21, 2000 PCT Filed Jun. 29, 1998 PCT Pub. No. WO99/00441 PCT Pub. Date Jan. 7, 1999The invention concerns monomers with dilactonic cycle and the corresponding polymers, their preparation, and materials containing these polymers. The monomers are of formula (IIIa) in which R is the residue of an acid derived from an ose such as glyconic, gylcuronic or glycaric acid and X represents in particular a methylene or ethylene group optionally substituted by at least an alkyl, allyl, aryl or aralkyl. The corresponding polymers are in the form of degradable non-toxic products and are used for example for packaging (films) or in medicine (implants).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08G 63/664; C07H 19/01; C07H 21/00; C08G 63/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 319/12 (2006.01); C07D 321/08 (2006.01); C07D 407/14 (2006.01); C08G 63/08 (2006.01); C08G 63/664 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 407/14 (2013.01); C08G 63/08 (2013.01); C08G 63/664 (2013.01); Y10T 428/29 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2982 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9900441A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6156429 A 20001205; CA 2295952 A1 19990107; EP 0991692 A1 20000412; JP 2002511113 A 20020409; WO 9900441 A1 19990107

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020218

2000-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000926

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000127

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE