Global Patent Index - EP 0991743 A1

EP 0991743 A1 2000-04-12 - DETERGENT AND CLEANING AGENT

Title (en)

DETERGENT AND CLEANING AGENT

Title (de)

WASCH- UND REINIGUNGSMITTEL

Title (fr)

DETERGENT ET PRODUIT DE NETTOYAGE

Publication

EP 0991743 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98937453 A

Priority

  • DE 19725508 A
  • EP 9803423 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19725508A1] The invention relates to a detergent and cleaning agent containing a combination of active substances consisting of a dirt-removing polymer and an alkane sulfonate and/or an alpha -olefin sulfonate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/00; C11D 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0036 (2013.01); C11D 1/37 (2013.01); C11D 3/3715 (2013.01); C11D 1/143 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9858044A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19725508 A1 19981224; AR 016073 A1 20010620; AU 8624998 A 19990104; DE 59813922 D1 20070412; EP 0991743 A1 20000412; EP 0991743 B1 20070228; ES 2283066 T3 20071016; JP 2002504948 A 20020212; JP 4237269 B2 20090311; US 2002042354 A1 20020411; US 6514927 B2 20030204; WO 9858044 A1 19981223

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160608

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170103

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160630

2017-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160608

2017-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59813922

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150424

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150430

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150409

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090609

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090609

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: CLARIANT PRODUKTE (DEUTSCHLAND) G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20090630

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080513

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080422

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080418

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-02-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071129

2007-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2283066 T3

2007-08-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-05-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070502

2007-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59813922 P 20070412

2007-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2007-02-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-03-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CLARIANT PRODUKTE (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH

2004-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040903

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000117

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI