Global Patent Index - EP 0991780 A2

EP 0991780 A2 2000-04-12 - METHOD AND TEST KIT FOR DETECTING MALIGNANT TUMOURS

Title (en)

METHOD AND TEST KIT FOR DETECTING MALIGNANT TUMOURS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND TESTKIT ZUM NACHWEIS BÖSARTIGER TUMORE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET TROUSSE D'ANALYSE PERMETTANT DE DETECTER LES TUMEURS MALIGNES

Publication

EP 0991780 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98942468 A

Priority

  • DE 9801806 W
  • DE 19727932 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19727932A1] The invention relates to a method for detecting mutations in the Bax gene in tumours using non-radioactive techniques and to a corresponding test kit containing 1) a DNA or RNA extraction module, 2) a primer mix (with a Hex-marked primer), 3) DNA obtained from control cell lines for amplifying the Bax wild type sequence, 4) DNA obtained from control cell lines for amplifying mutated Bax, and 5) a fragment length reference standard (Rox-marked fragment guide).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/6886 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/156 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9901573A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19727932 A1 19990107; AU 9061098 A 19990125; EP 0991780 A2 20000412; WO 9901573 A2 19990114; WO 9901573 A3 19990401

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-09 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1029141

2006-01-25 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051201

2004-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040708

2002-04-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: INVITEK GESELLSCHAFT FUER BIOTECHNIK & BIODESIGN M

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HILLEBRAND, TIMO

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DOERKEN, BERND

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WOLFF, GERHARD

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BENDZKO, PETER

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000117

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE