Global Patent Index - EP 0991789 A1

EP 0991789 A1 2000-04-12 - TOOL STEEL COMPOSITION

Title (en)

TOOL STEEL COMPOSITION

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNG VON WERKZEUGSTAHL

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION D'ACIER A OUTILS

Publication

EP 0991789 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99910459 A

Priority

  • FR 9900735 W
  • FR 9804122 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2777023A1] The invention concerns a composition for tool steel comprising, expressed in weight percentages: C: 0.3 - 0.4 %; Cr: 2.0 - 4.0 %; Mo: 0.8 - 3.0 %; V: 0.4 - 1.0 %; W: 1.5 - 3.0 %; Co: 1.0 - 5.0 %; Si: 0 - 1.0 %; Mn: 0 - 1.0 %; Ni: 0- 1.0 %, the rest mainly consisting of iron and unavoidable impurities. The invention also concerns the method for preparing said composition.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/18 (2006.01); C22C 38/22 (2006.01); C22C 38/24 (2006.01); C22C 38/30 (2006.01); C21D 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/30 (2013.01); C21D 1/18 (2013.01); C22C 38/22 (2013.01); C22C 38/24 (2013.01); C21D 1/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9951788A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2777023 A1 19991008; FR 2777023 B1 20000616; AT 239103 T 20030515; BR 9906337 A 20001003; CA 2292742 A1 19991014; DE 69907358 D1 20030605; DE 69907358 T2 20040325; DE 991789 T1 20010111; EP 0991789 A1 20000412; EP 0991789 B1 20030502; ES 2198903 T3 20040201; US 6280685 B1 20010828; WO 9951788 A1 19991014

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090330

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-05-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090330

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080317

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080329

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080311

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080220

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080319

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-10 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2006-11-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2006-11-10 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Ref Legal Event Code: CJ

2006-11-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2198903

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-10-29 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-08-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030802

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69907358

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2003-05-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-05-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030502

2001-01-11 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: DET

2000-10-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: TCAT

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991217

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL SE