Global patent index - EP 0991805 A1

EP 0991805 A1 2000-04-12 - DRIVE UNIT FOR A WASHING MACHINE

Title (en)

DRIVE UNIT FOR A WASHING MACHINE

Title (de)

ANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE WASCHMASCHINE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAINEMENT POUR LAVE-LINGE

Publication

EP 0991805 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98929430 A

Priority

  • DE 19726246 A
  • EP 9803422 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19726246A1] A washing drum is positioned inside a retaining sleeve (5) of a rigid bearing bracket (1) by means of an at least approximately horizontally arranged shaft (4), said bearing bracket (1) being mounted on a bottom surface (3) of a lye container. The inventive drive unit can be mounted on the rear side of the lye container. Said drive unit comprises a flat motor (7) with a stator support member (8), exciter windings (13) a rotor (10) and magnetisable poles (15), and drives the washing drum directly. The stator support member (8) and the rotor (10) of the motor (7) are detachably interconnected for the duration of transportation before the drive unit is finally mounted on the bottom surface (3) of the lye container, wherein the position of said stator support member (8) in relation to the rotor (10) corresponds to the operating position. This ensures that the motor (7) is already fully pre-assembled and tested on delivery to the washing machine manufacturing facility and can be built into the washing machines more simply. Therefore, no additional intervention is required in installing the motor (7). This avoids the risk of interfering with the tolerances which are necessary for the motor to function properly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 37/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 37/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 37/304 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49009 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19726246 A1 19981224; EP 0991805 A1 20000412; EP 0991805 B1 20020116; EP 0991805 B2 20070103; ES 2172155 T3 20020916; ES 2172155 T5 20070816; TR 9903158 T2 20010321; US 6131422 A 20001017; WO 9859102 A1 19981230

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20151022

2015-06-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59802647

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150402

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100609

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110715

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090624

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090629

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-08-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

2007-05-25 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2007-01-24 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

2007-01-03 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2006-10-04 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

- Effective date: 20060913

2004-05-06 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: MIELE & CIE. KG

- Effective date: 20021011

2004-05-06 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO.

- Effective date: 20021016

2004-04-21 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: MIELE & CIE. GMBH & CO.SCHUTZRECHTE/VERTRAE

- Effective date: 20021011

2004-04-21 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO.

- Effective date: 20021016

2004-01-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-01-08 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: MIELE & CIE. GMBH & CO. SCHUTZRECHTE/VERTRAEGE * 2

- Effective date: 20021011

2002-12-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: MIELE & CIE. GMBH & CO. SCHUTZRECHTE/VERTRAEGE

- Effective date: 20021011

2002-12-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO.

- Effective date: 20021010

2002-12-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: MIELE & CIE. GMBH & CO. SCHUTZRECHTE/VERTRAEGE

- Effective date: 20021011

2002-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2172155

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-06-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802647

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-02-21

2002-02-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020116

2002-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010308

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991108

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI