Global Patent Index - EP 0991816 A1

EP 0991816 A1 2000-04-12 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING PAPER

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING PAPER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON PAPIER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PAPIER

Publication

EP 0991816 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98936327 A

Priority

  • DE 19724695 A
  • DE 19734941 A
  • EP 9803530 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9856990A1] The invention relates to a method for producing paper, mat, laminate or similar material web (16) using a binder feeding mechansim (12) and by subsequent hardening, in particular of a material web (16) having high plybond strength which is then varnished. In this method, a water-dilutable acrylate in the form of a binder is fed to the material web at the binder feeding mechansim (12). The material web is then hardened by an electron beam, after the water content has been evaporated off. In accordance with the invention, after feeding the binder, or after the impregnation process, the material web (16) containing the noncrosslinked acrylate is dried and the water is evaporated from the binder, preferably an emulsion. The material web (16) is then printed and crosslinkage or polymerization begun. After printing, a varnish is applied that is capable of being hardened by an electron-beam. The material or paper web can be pressure-impregnated with the acrylate. The binder present in noncrosslinked residual paper, or the excess binder from the impregnating procedure, in particular acrylate emulsion, is preferably returned (18, 20, 28, 32) to the binder feeding mechansim (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 25/06; D21C 5/02; D21H 25/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 1/36 (2006.01); B41M 7/00 (2006.01); D21H 25/06 (2006.01); D21H 17/37 (2006.01); D21H 17/52 (2006.01); D21H 17/53 (2006.01); D21H 17/57 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 7/0081 (2013.01); B41M 1/36 (2013.01); B41M 7/0045 (2013.01); D21H 25/06 (2013.01); D21H 17/37 (2013.01); D21H 17/52 (2013.01); D21H 17/53 (2013.01); D21H 17/57 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9856990A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9856990 A1 19981217; AT 213291 T 20020215; CA 2293623 A1 19981217; CA 2293623 C 20070410; EP 0991816 A1 20000412; EP 0991816 B1 20020213; PL 337327 A1 20000814; TR 199903051 T2 20010221

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59803074

- Effective date: 20130101

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100611

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110420

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100610

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100610

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100610

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100610

2011-02-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090609

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090616

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090608

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090622

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090610

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-01-19 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1029150

2003-02-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021114

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020509

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803074 20020321

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB IT SE

2002-02-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020213

2002-02-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 213291 T 20020215

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991211

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB IT SE