Global Patent Index - EP 0991829 A1

EP 0991829 A1 2000-04-12 - ROSETTE-SHAPED HOLDING DEVICE FOR SCAFFOLD ELEMENTS

Title (en)

ROSETTE-SHAPED HOLDING DEVICE FOR SCAFFOLD ELEMENTS

Title (de)

ROSETTENFÖRMIGE HALTEVORRICHTUNG FÜR GERÜSTELEMENTE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ARRET EN FORME DE ROSACE POUR ELEMENT D'ECHAFAUDAGE

Publication

EP 0991829 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98937512 A

Priority

  • DE 19726950 A
  • EP 9803748 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9900564A1] The invention relates to a discoid, substantially circular holding device mounted on vertical scaffold tubes and fitted with holes into which scaffold elements, extending horizontally and/or diagonally, can be fixed. The device has at least two indentations around its periphery which lie opposite each other on a central axis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 7/30 (2006.01); E04G 7/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 7/32 (2013.01); E04G 7/307 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9900564A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9900564 A1 19990107; AU 8628098 A 19990119; CA 2297148 A1 19990107; DE 19726950 A1 19990204; DE 19726950 C2 19991223; EP 0991829 A1 20000412; EP 0991829 B1 20011004; ES 2163288 T3 20020116

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-20 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20161219

2017-01-20 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: ALTRAD PLETTAC ASSCO GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20161219

2017-01-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ALTRAD PLETTAC ASSCO GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20161219

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160714

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-09-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2163288 T3

2002-01-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011023

2001-11-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801651 20011108

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000125

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT