Global patent index - EP 0991832 A1

EP 0991832 A1 2000-04-12 - ROTATING CATCH LOCK, SPECIALLY FOR MOTOR VEHICLES

Title (en)

ROTATING CATCH LOCK, SPECIALLY FOR MOTOR VEHICLES

Title (de)

DREHFALLENSCHLOSS, INSBESONDERE FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

SERRURE A LOQUET TOURNANT, EN PARTICULIER POUR VEHICULES A MOTEUR

Publication

EP 0991832 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98934956 A

Priority

  • DE 19725416 A
  • EP 9803564 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9858146A1] The invention relates to a rotating catch lock, wherein a closing member (10) interacts with a catch (20), which can be rotated between a closing position accommodating the closing member (10) and an open position which releases said member. The catch (20) is force-loaded (22) in an open position and is held by a spring-loaded (33) rotating latch (30) in the closed position. Said latch (30) is moved by a motor (50) between the locking position retaining the catch (20) and a stand-by release position in which the spring-loaded latch (30) is propped up by the catch (20) as long as it remains in an open position. In order to use small compact motors (50), the invention provides that the stored energy (61) exerted by an energy storage mechanism (60) is transmitted to the latch (30) via a storage lever (40). Normally, the latch (30) is shifted into its stand-by position by the storage lever (40). When the latch (30) is in a stand-by position, the storage lever (40) is supported on a control tappet (51) which is rotationally driven by the motor (50). The motor (50) can be driven by an electrical control logic in both a forward mode (56) unloading the energy storage (60) and a reverse mode (56') loading the energy storage (60), i.e. in opposite directions. In the reverse mode (56') the control tappet (51) releases the latch (30), moves towards the storage lever (40) and guides it back into a starting position which corresponds to the stand-by position of the latch (30).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60J 5/00 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 81/14 (2014.01); E05B 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/14 (2013.01); E05B 2015/0448 (2013.01); Y10S 292/23 (2013.01); Y10T 70/65 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7051 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7062 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1047 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1082 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9858146A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9858146 A1 19981223; WO 9858146 B1 19990325; BR 9810523 A 20000919; CN 1168883 C 20040929; CN 1260854 A 20000719; DE 19725416 C1 19990121; EP 0991832 A1 20000412; EP 0991832 B1 20050302; ES 2235344 T3 20050701; JP 2002510367 A 20020402; KR 20010013868 A 20010226; US 6435573 B1 20020820

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160629

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160229

2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140613

2015-08-31 [PGRI FR] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20150409

2015-07-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150728

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140612

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140627

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-08 [REG FR D3] DECISION TO REVOKE THE DECISION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: D3

- Effective date: 20150409

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140612

2015-03-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150227

2015-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140612

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130621

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130626

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120625

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-21 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 59812620

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120425

2008-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050602

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2005-08-17 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-07-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2235344

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-04-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59812620

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-04-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

2005-03-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050302

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030801

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991125

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE