Global Patent Index - EP 0991833 A1

EP 0991833 A1 2000-04-12 - DRIVING DEVICE FOR LOCKING AND UNLOCKING A LOCK WITH CONDITIONAL OPENING

Title (en)

DRIVING DEVICE FOR LOCKING AND UNLOCKING A LOCK WITH CONDITIONAL OPENING

Title (de)

ANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG ZUR VERRIEGELUNG UND ENTRIEGELUNG EINES BEDINGT BETÄTIGBAREN SCHLOSSES

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAINEMENT PERMETTANT LE VERROUILLAGE ET LE DEVERROUILLAGE D'UNE SERRURE A OUVERTURE CONDITIONNELLE

Publication

EP 0991833 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98932099 A

Priority

  • EP 98932099 A
  • EP 9803206 W
  • EP 97108693 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0881346A1] The drive consists of a motor (MT), a transmission mechanism (28) and a lock assembly which is connected mechanically to the motor via the transmission mechanism so it can be set in active and inactive positions. It also contains elastic elements (48) which allow the lock assembly to be armed when moved by the motor into its active position. The elastic elements are mounted on the motor drive shaft (46) and comprise at least one radial arm (51) which can be operated by the motor and is designed to interact with the transmission mechanism to move the lock assembly into its active position. They can be, for example, in the form of two arms (50, 51) in a forked configuration, both driven by the motor and interacting with the transmission mechanism to move the lock assembly into both its active and inactive positions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00; E05B 47/00; E05B 47/06; E05B 65/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 47/06 (2006.01); E05B 49/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/00 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01); E05B 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/0075 (2013.01); E05B 47/0012 (2013.01); E05B 47/0603 (2013.01); G07C 9/00912 (2013.01); E05B 2015/0486 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0021 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0031 (2013.01); Y10T 70/7006 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7034 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7062 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9854429A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0881346 A1 19981202; CA 2289556 A1 19981203; DE 69801912 D1 20011108; DE 69801912 T2 20020627; EP 0991833 A1 20000412; EP 0991833 B1 20011004; ES 2166169 T3 20020401; US 6434984 B1 20020820; WO 9854429 A1 19981203

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070529

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070530

2008-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070530

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070529

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070529

2008-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-12 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060512

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060505

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-04 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060504

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060425

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-09-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2002-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2166169 T3

2002-01-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020102

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69801912 20011108

2001-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991230

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI