Global Patent Index - EP 0991837 A1

EP 0991837 A1 2000-04-12 - HINGE FOR ACCOMMODATING A PIVOTING COMPONENT

Title (en)

HINGE FOR ACCOMMODATING A PIVOTING COMPONENT

Title (de)

SCHARNIER ZUM SCHWENKBAREN LAGERN EINES BAUTEILS

Title (fr)

CHARNIERE POUR LE POSITIONNEMENT PIVOTANT D'UN ELEMENT

Publication

EP 0991837 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98939504 A

Priority

  • DE 19726536 A
  • EP 9803611 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19726536A1] The invention relates to a pivotingly accommodated component which moves automatically when acted upon by a regulating force (15), but in such a way that is both braked and damped, and thus moves with reduced speed and momentum. To this end, the hinge accommodating the component is fitted with a pivoting brake (12) whose brake force, applied along the pivoting path, is less than the regulating force (15), and is adapted to the course of the regulating force (15) along said pivoting path. In selected areas, the brake force (16) of the pivoting brake (12) can be greater than the regulating force (15) in order to hold the component in these areas. The braking work effected by the pivoting brake (12) is advantageously calculated so as to absorb 20 % to 25 % of the regulating work effected by the positioning force.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 11/084 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/536 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/548 (2013.01); Y10T 16/540257 (2013.01); Y10T 16/54038 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9859139A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19726536 A1 19981224; EP 0991837 A1 20000412; EP 0991837 B1 20010912; ES 2163881 T3 20020201; JP 2000513062 A 20001003; KR 20010020492 A 20010315; US 6349449 B1 20020226; WO 9859139 A1 19981230

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-06-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070622

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-06-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050616

2004-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030617

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-02-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030616

2003-06-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030617

2003-06-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030616

2002-09-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-06-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020613

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020611

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020605

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-02-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020125

2002-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2163881

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-10-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59801461

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-10-18

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-06-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001016

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991130

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT