Global Patent Index - EP 0991848 A1

EP 0991848 A1 2000-04-12 - CHISEL ARRANGEMENT FOR CUTTING CHISELS OF A TOOL HOLDER MOUNTED IN A ROTATING MANNER

Title (en)

CHISEL ARRANGEMENT FOR CUTTING CHISELS OF A TOOL HOLDER MOUNTED IN A ROTATING MANNER

Title (de)

MEISSELANORDNUNG FÜR SCHNEIDMEISSEL EINES ROTIEREND GELAGERTEN WERKZEUGTRÄGERS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR OUTIL TRANCHANT D'UN PORTE-OUTIL MONTE ROTATIF

Publication

EP 0991848 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98929115 A

Priority

  • AT 9800156 W
  • AT 109897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9900580A1] The invention relates to a chisel arrangement for the cutting chisels of a tool holder mounted in a rotating manner, such as a cutter head or cutting rollers, in which the chisel tips are inclined in a leading manner in the direction of rotation and the direction of circumference of the tool holder and the chisel can be tilted by overcoming a spring force. The tilt axis of the chisel (1) is positioned on the tool holder (7) in the direction of the circumference and rotation of the chisel (1) in front of the projection of the chisel tip towards the axis of rotation (9) of the tool holder (7). In the contact position, the chisel (1) is supported against a spring (3) in a tiltable manner.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21C 35/18; E21C 35/19; E21C 35/193

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21C 35/18 (2006.01); E21C 35/19 (2006.01); E21C 35/193 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21C 35/18 (2013.01); E21C 35/19 (2013.01); E21C 35/193 (2013.01); E21C 2035/191 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9900580A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9900580 A1 19990107; AT 213051 T 20020215; AT 408017 B 20010827; AT A109897 A 20001215; AU 7897698 A 19990119; DE 59803023 D1 20020321; EP 0991848 A1 20000412; EP 0991848 B1 20020206; ZA 9805311 B 19990111

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59803023

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140101

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-06-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030622

2003-01-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020829

2002-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020531

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803023

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-03-21

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2002-02-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020206

2002-02-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 213051

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010522

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991220

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT