Global Patent Index - EP 0991858 A1

EP 0991858 A1 2000-04-12 - DECELERATOR DEVICE MOUNTED IN THE EXHAUST GAS CIRCUIT OF A VEHICLE EQUIPPED WITH A COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

DECELERATOR DEVICE MOUNTED IN THE EXHAUST GAS CIRCUIT OF A VEHICLE EQUIPPED WITH A COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

IN EINER ABGASLEITUNG ANGEORDNETE BREMSVORRICHTUNG EINES FAHRZEUGES MIT BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF RALENTISSEUR MONTE DANS LE CIRCUIT D'ECHAPPEMENT DES GAZ D'UN VEHICULE EQUIPE D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION

Publication

EP 0991858 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99915822 A

Priority

  • FR 9900966 W
  • FR 9805211 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2777946A1] The retarder consists of a valve with a housing (4) forming a channel (5), a shutter (7) on a control shaft (8), and a balancer (20) with a calibrated valve (22) in an outlet duct (21). The balancer is incorporated in the valve housing and has a guide bush (10) for the control shaft and an axial cavity (23) for the calibrated valve and its spring (27), which are coaxial with the shaft. The outlet duct (21) lies perpendicular to the shaft and discharges into the channel (5) after the shutter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/06 (2006.01); F02D 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/106 (2013.01); F02D 9/06 (2013.01); F02D 9/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954612A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2777946 A1 19991029; FR 2777946 B1 20000616; AT 221956 T 20020815; AU 3426699 A 19991108; CA 2294093 A1 19991028; DE 69902429 D1 20020912; DE 69902429 T2 20030508; EP 0991858 A1 20000412; EP 0991858 B1 20020807; KR 20010020489 A 20010315; RU 2218469 C2 20031210; TR 9903201 T1 20000721; US 6273058 B1 20010814; WO 9954612 A1 19991028

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050422

2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-01-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040422

2004-11-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-04-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040423

2004-04-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040422

2003-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *FOWA LE FREIN MOTEUR

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-07-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-05-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030502

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-04-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 0991858E

2003-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030430

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-04-23 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030423

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-04-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030416

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-04-10 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030410

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030228

2002-11-22 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021122

2002-11-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021025

2002-11-07 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-09-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69902429 20020912

2002-09-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2002-08-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-08-07 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-08-07 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 221956 T 20020815

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020221

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991223

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE