Global patent index - EP 0991863 A1

EP 0991863 A1 2000-04-12 - RADIAL PISTON PUMP

Title (en)

RADIAL PISTON PUMP

Title (de)

RADIALKOLBENPUMPE MIT DICHTUNG AM ANTRIEBSWELLENENDE ZUR FLUIDDICHTEN KAPSELUNG DES PUMPENRAUMES

Title (fr)

POMPE A PISTONS RADIAUX

Publication

EP 0991863 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98936190 A

Priority

  • DE 9801646 W
  • DE 19725565 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19826961A1] Rotary motion of a drive shaft (10) is converted by an eccentric member (20), on the end of the shaft, to radial motion of a feed member (50) of a feed unit (2) in a radial piston pump particularly used as fuel pump in a motor vehicle. An eccentric-side (36,38) seal member is arranged to slide in the peripheral direction of the eccentric member, while a housing-side (28,33) seal member is in a fluid-tight location on the pump housing (4). The drive shaft Is mounted in the pump housing on a shaft bearing (18). Preferably an orbital motion is provided between the housing-side and eccentric-side sealing members.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/06 (2006.01); F02M 59/44 (2006.01); F04B 1/04 (2006.01); F04B 1/047 (2006.01); F04B 1/053 (2006.01); F04B 9/04 (2006.01); F04B 53/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/0448 (2013.01); F04B 9/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9858171A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

DE 19826961 A1 19981224; BR 9810179 A 20011127; EP 0991863 A1 20000412; EP 0991863 B1 20021120; JP 2002508821 A 20020319; KR 20010013938 A 20010226; US 6328537 B1 20011211; WO 9858171 A1 19981223; WO 9858172 A1 19981223

INPADOC legal status

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-06-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59806362

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-02

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010611

2000-06-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HYDRAULIK-RING GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991217

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR