Global patent index - EP 0991864 A1

EP 0991864 A1 2000-04-12 - PISTON PUMP FOR THICK MATTER

Title (en)

PISTON PUMP FOR THICK MATTER

Title (de)

KOLBENPUMPE FÜR DICKSTOFFE

Title (fr)

POMPE A PISTON POUR MATIERES CONSISTANTES

Publication

EP 0991864 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98937452 A

Priority

  • DE 19727103 A
  • EP 9803403 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19727103A1] The invention relates to a piston pump for thick matter such as concrete, sewage sludge, excavated tunnel material and similar. The inventive piston pump has at least one hydraulically operated pump cylinder (10, 12). The pump piston (30) of said pump cylinder (10, 12) is connected to the piston (38) of a hydraulic drive cylinder (26, 28) by a common piston rod (34). A water box (42) is situated between the pump cylinders (10, 12) and the drive cylinders (26, 28), the piston rod (34) passing through said water box (42) for cleaning purposes. Said water box (42) has an assembly opening (44) at the top end, said opening being accessible from above, and a closeable water outlet nozzle (66) located at the bottom end. The water box also has an assembly opening located at the bottom end for easier assembly. Said bottom-end assembly opening (54) can be closed in such a way that it is liquid-tight by means of a removable base plate (52).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 15/02 (2013.01); Y10S 417/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9900599A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19727103 A1 19990107; EP 0991864 A1 20000412; EP 0991864 B1 20020403; ES 2173605 T3 20021016; US 6116865 A 20000912; WO 9900599 A1 19990107

INPADOC legal status

2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140607

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150724

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140606

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-03-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150227

2015-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140606

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130703

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130619

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120615

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-09-02 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2011-06-22 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: PUTZMEISTER ENGINEERING GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20110610

2011-02-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110113 AND 20110119

2009-02-20 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2009-02-20 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Ref Legal Event Code: CJ

2003-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030106

2002-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2173605

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-07-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020701

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803633

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-08

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010522

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990503

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT