Global patent index - EP 0991910 A1

EP 0991910 A1 2000-04-12 - DELAY ACTION FUSE ASSEMBLY FOR PYROTECHNICAL DEVICE

Title (en)

DELAY ACTION FUSE ASSEMBLY FOR PYROTECHNICAL DEVICE

Title (de)

ZEITZÜNDER FÜR EINE PYROTECHNISCHE VORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

BOUCHON ALLUMEUR RETARD POUR ENGIN PYROTECHNIQUE

Publication

EP 0991910 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 97931871 A

Priority

FR 9701204 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9901715A2] The invention concerns a delay action fuse assembly for a pyrotechnical device, in particular a hand or mechanical grenade, comprising a body (4) wherein is contained a main charge (66) and a triggering lever (16) co-operating with a delay action device (8) ensuring the initiation of the charge (66) with a predetermined delay after the lever is actuated (16). The fuse assembly further comprises a locking member (18) blocking the lever (16) movement. The delay action device (8) comprises time delay means for ensuring initiation of the charge and electronic means for triggering the time delay means. Said electronic triggering means comprise means for comparing the time elapsed between the release of the locking member (18) and the lever (16) movement, to a reference time interval, to trigger the delay action device only if said time lapse is greater than said reference time interval.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42C 14/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42C 11/00 (2006.01); F42C 15/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42C 11/003 (2013.01); F42C 15/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9901715A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9901715 A2 19990114; WO 9901715 A3 20020214; AT 216487 T 20020515; AU 3547297 A 19990125; DE 69712109 D1 20020523; DE 69712109 T2 20021031; EP 0991910 A1 20000412; EP 0991910 B1 20020417; ES 2174266 T3 20021101

INPADOC legal status

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070705

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050803

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070705

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070704

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070704

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070704

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RUGGIERI

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060717

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060629

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-16 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060616

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-09-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050913

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-04-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030120

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2174266

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-07-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69712109

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-23

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES GB

2002-04-17 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D17D

2002-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 216487

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-04-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 42C 11/00 A

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES GB

2000-07-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000525

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000124

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES GB