Global patent index - EP 0991911 A1

EP 0991911 A1 2000-04-12 - DEVICE FOR PROVOKING THE COLLAPSE OF A SNOW CORNICE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR PROVOKING THE COLLAPSE OF A SNOW CORNICE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG DIE DAS EINSTÜRZEN EINER SCHNEEPLATTEEINLEITET

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR PROVOQUER LA RUPTURE D'UNE CORNICHE DE NEIGE

Publication

EP 0991911 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98924519 A

Priority

  • FR 9708245 A
  • IB 9800971 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2765320A1] The invention concerns a device for provoking the collapse of a snow cornice comprising several exploders (11). Each exploder (11) consists of a main cylinder (12), perpendicular to the support base (14) arranged flat on the ground, and a positioning tube (13) connected to the main cylinder and mounted on a rigid seat (15) fixed to the mountain side. A supply conduit (20), connected by conduits (23, 24) respectively to an oxygen cylinder and a propane cylinder stored in a shelter (22), supplies via conduit sections (9) a detonating gas mixture, obtained from two gases, into the positioning tube (13) and into the main cylinder (12). Igniting means (21) mounted upstream of the supply conduit (20) ensure the ignition of the detonating gas mixture.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42D 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42D 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9900637A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

FR 2765320 A1 19981231; FR 2765320 B1 19990917; AT 205297 T 20010915; CA 2292810 A1 19990107; DE 69801580 D1 20011011; DE 69801580 T2 20020711; EP 0991911 A1 20000412; EP 0991911 B1 20010905; ES 2163277 T3 20020116; JP 2002506511 A 20020226; US 6279481 B1 20010828; WO 9900637 A1 19990107

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070622

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060623

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060623

2006-06-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060622

2005-09-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050921

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050709

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050629

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050621

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050530

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-08-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2163277

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: CABINET ROLAND NITHARDT CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDU

2001-10-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69801580

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-10-11

2001-09-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2001-09-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 205297

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010118

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991204

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI