Global Patent Index - EP 0991912 A1

EP 0991912 A1 2000-04-12 - DEVICE FOR PROVOKING AN AVALANCHE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR PROVOKING AN AVALANCHE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSLÖSUNG EINER LAWINE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE DECLENCHEMENT D'UNE AVALANCHE

Publication

EP 0991912 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98924520 A

Priority

  • FR 9708246 A
  • IB 9800972 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2765321A1] The invention concerns a device (10) for provoking an avalanche comprising a gas gun (12) the end of which is fixed to a seat (13) solidly anchored to the mountain and the downstream end of which is borne by at least one leg (14) such that the mouth of the gun is arranged above the snow cover. The gun (12) upstream end is fixed to the seat (13) by an articulation (17), and the downstream end is ballasted, the leg (14) being mounted freely on a base (15) made integral with the ground. Said leg (14) is hollow and contains ballast consisting of chippings or concrete. Said gun (12) is further provided with ignition means (54) arranged upstream in its proximity and ensures the ignition of the detonating gas mixture.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42D 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42D 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9900638A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

FR 2765321 A1 19981231; FR 2765321 B1 19990917; AT 205298 T 20010915; CA 2292812 A1 19990107; CA 2292812 C 20060912; DE 69801581 D1 20011011; DE 69801581 T2 20020711; EP 0991912 A1 20000412; EP 0991912 B1 20010905; ES 2163278 T3 20020116; JP 2002506512 A 20020226; JP 3956060 B2 20070808; US 6374717 B1 20020423; WO 9900638 A1 19990107

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160616

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160513

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160428

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-08-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2163278 T3

2001-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: CABINET ROLAND NITHARDT CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDU

2001-10-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69801581 20011011

2001-09-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2001-09-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 205298 T 20010915

2001-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001211

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991204

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI