Global Patent Index - EP 0991979 A1

EP 0991979 A1 2000-04-12 - FILM AND BATTERY LOADING METHOD FOR A SINGLE USE CAMERA SUCH AS A SINGLE USE APS CAMERA AND A CAMERA LOADED ACCORDING TO THE SAME

Title (en)

FILM AND BATTERY LOADING METHOD FOR A SINGLE USE CAMERA SUCH AS A SINGLE USE APS CAMERA AND A CAMERA LOADED ACCORDING TO THE SAME

Title (de)

LADUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE EINWEGKAMERA, WIE EINE APS-EINWEGKAMERA, UND EINE KAMERA GELADEN NACH DEM VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE CHARGEMENT DE FILM ET DE BATTERIE POUR UN APPAREIL PHOTOGRAPHIQUE A USAGE UNIQUE TEL QU'UN APPAREIL PHOTOGRAPHIQUE A USAGE UNIQUE AVEC REGLAGE AUTOMATIQUE DE L'IMAGE ET APPAREIL PHOTOGRAPHIQUE CHARGE PAR CE PROCEDE

Publication

EP 0991979 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97938451 A

Priority

  • US 9714626 W
  • US 71378096 A
  • US 71292896 A
  • US 85490197 A
  • US 85507797 A
  • US 85507397 A
  • US 85514997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9811469A1] A method and an apparatus for pre-loading a single use camera with film (24). The camera is pre-loaded in non-darkroom with the back cover assembled to the camera without exposing any substantial portion of the film (24). The camera has a film advance mechanism (22) that employs a manual advance wheel (40) which is rotated in opposing directions to pre-load film from a film cassette (26) in the camera to a film spool compartment and to wind film back into the film cassette (26) from the film spool compartment (16) as exposures are taken. The film advance mechanism (22) also opens and closes the film cassette's light lock door (28) and employs a film sensor to disable the film advance mechanism (22) from operating the light lock door (28) when film is present in a film path (68a) of the camera. The battery (90) is inserted inside the film spool compartment (16) to minimize the camera size.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03B 1/18; G03B 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03B 17/02 (2006.01); G03B 17/24 (2006.01); G03B 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03B 19/04 (2013.01); G03B 2219/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9811469 A1 19980319; AU 4077197 A 19980402; AU 734745 B2 20010621; BR 9712043 A 20000118; CA 2265760 A1 19980319; CN 1255207 A 20000531; EP 0991979 A1 20000412; EP 0991979 A4 20020109; HU 0204507 A2 20030428; JP 2002528044 A 20020827; PL 359247 A1 20040823

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060411

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031201

2002-01-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011122

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 03B 1/18 A, 7G 03B 17/02 B, 7G 03B 17/30 B, 7G 03B 19/04 B

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990413

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE