Global Patent Index - EP 0991994 A1

EP 0991994 A1 2000-04-12 - IMPROVED MICROPROCESSOR

Title (en)

IMPROVED MICROPROCESSOR

Title (de)

VERBESSERTER MIKROPROZESSOR

Title (fr)

MICROPROCESSEUR AMELIORE

Publication

EP 0991994 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97936951 A

Priority

US 9711616 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9859292A1] A microprocessor for a host computer designed to execute target application programs including the combination of code morphing software, and morph host hardware designed to execute instructions of a host instruction set, the combination translating a target instruction set into a host instruction set, optimizing the host instruction set speculating upon the occurrence of a condition, determining under control of the code morphing software official state of the target computer, updating state of the target computer from state of the host computer when a set of host instructions executes in accordance with the speculation, detecting failure of the condition during execution, updating state from the state of the target computer when a set of host instruction fails to execute in accordance with the speculation, and translating a new set of host instructions without the speculation when a set of host instructions fails to execute in accordance with the speculation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 9/45

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/30 (2006.01); G06F 9/318 (2006.01); G06F 9/38 (2006.01); G06F 9/45 (2006.01); G06F 9/455 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 8/52 (2013.01); G06F 9/30174 (2013.01); G06F 9/3842 (2013.01); G06F 9/3861 (2013.01); G06F 9/3885 (2013.01); G06F 9/45504 (2013.01); G06F 9/45554 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9859292 A1 19981230; CA 2283776 A1 19981230; CA 2283776 C 20031111; EP 0991994 A1 20000412; EP 0991994 A4 20011128; JP 2001519953 A 20011023; JP 3776132 B2 20060517; KR 100443759 B1 20040809; KR 20010014094 A 20010226

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-09 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20091217

2009-08-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: INTELLECTUAL VENTURE FUNDING LLC

2008-06-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRANSMETA CORPORATION

2005-05-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050408

2001-11-28 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011015

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06F 9/45 A, 7G 06F 9/455 B

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000125

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE