Global Patent Index - EP 0992012 A1

EP 0992012 A1 2000-04-12 - AN AUTOMATED DOCUMENT CASHING SYSTEM

Title (en)

AN AUTOMATED DOCUMENT CASHING SYSTEM

Title (de)

AUTOMATISCHES KASSIERSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME AUTOMATISE D'ENCAISSEMENT DE DOCUMENTS

Publication

EP 0992012 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98924920 A

Priority

  • US 9810788 W
  • US 86613997 A
  • US 86614097 A
  • US 86569197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9859308A1] An automated document cashing system includes a reader (58, 60) for capturing an image of a negotiable instrument and recognizing the authorized signature as well as the amount written thereon. The system then can transfer monies in the amount of the instrument to a savings account, a checking account, a smart card, or the like. The system can cash money orders as well as write money orders (76). The system will also wire transfer money. The image capture apparatus also can capture an image of a utility bill or the like that is presented by a user. By supplying monies in the form of cash (62), credit card authorization, smart card balance, or the like, the user can pay bills such as a utility bill through the system or purchase items dispensed by the system (87, 88, 89, 89a).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60; G07F 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 9/00 (2006.01); G06Q 20/00 (2012.01); G06Q 30/00 (2012.01); G07F 7/04 (2006.01); G07F 7/10 (2006.01); G07F 7/12 (2006.01); G07F 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/08 (2013.01); G06Q 20/04 (2013.01); G06Q 20/042 (2013.01); G06Q 20/10 (2013.01); G06Q 20/14 (2013.01); G06Q 20/18 (2013.01); G06Q 20/341 (2013.01); G06Q 30/06 (2013.01); G07F 7/04 (2013.01); G07F 7/12 (2013.01); G07F 19/20 (2013.01); G07F 19/202 (2013.01); G07F 19/209 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9859308 A1 19981230; AU 750152 B2 20020711; AU 7697898 A 19990104; CA 2292588 A1 19981230; CA 2292588 C 20100720; CA 2703131 A1 19981230; EP 0992012 A1 20000412; EP 0992012 A4 20060104; JP 2002502531 A 20020122; JP 2008077680 A 20080403

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-04 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: G06F0017600000

- IPC: G06Q0050000000

- Effective date: 20140724

2014-05-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20131203

2007-11-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071017

2006-01-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20051123

2006-01-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 17/60 19950101AFI19990308BHEP

2006-01-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G07F 7/08 19740701ALI20051117BHEP

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991222

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE