Global Patent Index - EP 0992015 A1

EP 0992015 A1 2000-04-12 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONFIRMATION AND SETTLEMENT FOR FINANCIAL TRANSACTIONS MATCHING

Title (en)

METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONFIRMATION AND SETTLEMENT FOR FINANCIAL TRANSACTIONS MATCHING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM BESTÄTIGEN VON KORRESPONDIERENDEN FINANZIELLEN TRANSAKTIONEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE CONFIRMATION ET DE REGLEMENT POUR LA MISE EN CORRESPONDANCE DE TRANSACTIONS FINANCIERES

Publication

EP 0992015 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98931248 A

Priority

  • US 9812232 W
  • US 4985197 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9858333A1] The present invention, an embodiement of which is known as Crossmar Matching Service (CMS) (35) provides a method and system for matching order routing of securities and other instruments types, and for matching other transaction information on a post-execution basis, such as during the confirmation and settlement phases. The functions of the present invention occur on the post-execution side of the value chain and include matching the financials, matching the delivery instructions, confirming those deliveries and instructions. The method and system of the present invention thus further provide a confirmation and settlement for these functions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 40/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 40/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9858333 A1 19981223; AU 8141998 A 19990104; EP 0992015 A1 20000412; EP 0992015 A4 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150106

2007-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070503

2007-01-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CITIBANK, N.A.

2002-11-20 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021007

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991125

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19991125;LT PAYMENT 19991125;LV PAYMENT 19991125;MK PAYMENT 19991125;RO PAYMENT 19991125;SI PAYMENT 19991125