Global patent index - EP 0992016 A2

EP 0992016 A2 2000-04-12 - IMPROVEMENTS IN, OR RELATING TO, THE DISTRIBUTION OF INFORMATION

Title (en)

IMPROVEMENTS IN, OR RELATING TO, THE DISTRIBUTION OF INFORMATION

Title (de)

VERBESSERUNGEN BEI BZW. IM BEZUG AUF DIE VERTEILUNG VON INFORMATIONEN

Title (fr)

AMELIORATIONS APPORTEES A LA DIFFUSION D'INFORMATIONS

Publication

EP 0992016 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98932679 A

Priority

  • SE 9801242 W
  • SE 9702552 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9901018A2] The present invention is based on a mechanism which enables information providers to direct their offerings to individual information users during those periods when an information user has a high probability of requiring the information on offer. The system of the present invention comprises three entities, an information user terminal, of which there may be a plurality, information providers, of which there may also be a plurality, and an information broker's file server. These entities are linked via the Internet. Thus, the present invention is based on a system having the following functional elements: an agent-based information gathering, packaging, and presentation sub-system; a database for storage of statistical and dynamic information on customers; distribution of advertising from companies to individual customers; distribution of targeted advertising/promotional materials to individual customers; and filtration of unwanted information on an individual customer basis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9901018A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FI FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9901018 A2 19990114; WO 9901018 A3 19990401; EE 03631 B1 20020215; EE 9900605 A 20000815; EP 0992016 A2 20000412; NO 318564 B1 20050411; NO 996422 A 20000301; NO 996422 D0 19991223; SE 510438 C2 19990525; SE 9702552 D0 19970702; SE 9702552 L 19990103

INPADOC legal status

2013-02-13 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20121011

2012-10-11 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R003

2007-11-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TELIASONERA AB

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2007-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070904

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FI FR GB LI NL SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 20000202;LV PAYMENT 20000202