Global Patent Index - EP 0992023 A4

EP 0992023 A4 2001-04-18 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PARALLEL AND PERSPECTIVE REAL-TIME VOLUME VISUALIZATION

Title (en)

APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PARALLEL AND PERSPECTIVE REAL-TIME VOLUME VISUALIZATION

Title (de)

GERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR PARALLELEN UND PERSPEKTIVISCHEN ECHTZEIT-VOLUMEN-VISUALISIERUNG

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ET PROCEDE POUR LA VISUALISATION DE VOLUME EN TEMPS REEL, EN PARALLELE ET EN PERSPECTIVE

Publication

EP 0992023 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98918164 A

Priority

  • US 9807405 W
  • US 4301397 P
  • US 91057597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9847105A1] An apparatus including a three-dimensional buffer (438); a pixel bus (442); a plurality of rendering pipelines (440); and a control unit(454). Each rendering pipeline includes a first slice unit (544); a compositing unit (464); a two-dimensional slice compositing buffer (474); and a first interpolation unit (472 or 546). Sample point values are combined with pixels of the compositing buffer in the compositing unit along a plurality of interslice ray segments (410) which extend only between a current slice contained in the slice unit and a slice contained in the two-dimensional slice compositing buffer. Gradients are also computed at voxel positions to improve accuracy.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06T 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06T 15/10 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06T 15/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] PFISTER H ET AL: "CUBE-4 - A SCALABLE ARCHITECTURE FOR REAL-TIME VOLUME RENDERING", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SYMPOSIUM ON VOLUME VISUALIZATION,US,NEW YORK, IEEE/ACM, 1996, pages 47 - 54, XP000724429, ISBN: 0-89791-865-7
  • [X] MACHIRAJU R K ET AL: "EFFICIENT FEED-FORWARD VOLUME RENDERING TECHINIQUES FOR VECTOR AND PARALLEL PROCESSORS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SUPERCOMPUTING CONFERENCE,US,LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, vol. -, 15 November 1993 (1993-11-15), pages 699 - 708, XP000437407
  • See also references of WO 9847105A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9847105 A1 19981022; AU 7113998 A 19981111; AU 732652 B2 20010426; CA 2285966 A1 19981022; EP 0992023 A1 20000412; EP 0992023 A4 20010418; JP H11508386 A 19990721

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031031

2001-04-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010305

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991025

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE