Global Patent Index - EP 0992035 A1

EP 0992035 A1 2000-04-12 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A MASTER DISC UNIT AND A MATRIX PRODUCED THEREFROM AND ADAPTER RING FOR MANUFACTURING THE MASTER DISC UNIT

Title (en)

METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A MASTER DISC UNIT AND A MATRIX PRODUCED THEREFROM AND ADAPTER RING FOR MANUFACTURING THE MASTER DISC UNIT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ORIGINALPLATTE, DARAUS HERGESTELLTE MATRIZE UND ADAPTERRING ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER ORIGINALPLATTE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN DISQUE MATRICE, MATRICE PRODUITE A PARTIR DE CE DISQUE ET ANNEAU D'ADAPTATION DESTINE A LA PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 0992035 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98930022 A

Priority

  • SE 9801215 W
  • SE 9702491 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9903100A1] The present invention relates to a method, starting from a micro-structured substrate disc (18) of a first diameter, of manufacturing a master disc unit intended for the manufacture of a disc-shaped matrix of a second, larger diameter for reproduction of micromechanical products, kinoforms or mirror copies of such a matrix. According to the invention, the micro-structured substrate disc (18) is placed with its structured side (24) against a flat supporting surface (26). Thereafter, a flat, annular element (10) is placed on the flat supporting surface (26) with the annular element (10) coaxially surrounding the substrate disc (18) to form an annular slot between the annular element (10) and the substrate disc (18). The substrate disc (18) and the annular element (10) are joined together by means of an adhesive (28) to form a raw master disc unit. The invention also relates to a method of manufacturing a disc-shaped matrix with the aid of the master disc unit formed. A disc-shaped press matrix can be formed against a metallized side of the master disc unit in a manner known per se by electroplating. The invention also relates to an adapter ring for manufacturing a master disc unit. This ring has flat opposite sides (12, 14), an outer diameter corresponding to or exceeding the outer diameter of the matrix to be manufactured by the master disc unit, and a hole diameter somewhat exceeding the diameter of a structured substrate disc (18) which is to be concentrically surrounded by and joined to the adapter ring (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 7/26; B29C 45/26; B29D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29D 11/00 (2006.01); B29D 17/00 (2006.01); G11B 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29D 11/00769 (2013.01); B29D 11/00 (2013.01); B29D 17/00 (2013.01); G11B 7/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9903100A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9903100 A1 19990121; AU 7950398 A 19990208; EP 0992035 A1 20000412; SE 512483 C2 20000320; SE 9702491 D0 19970627; SE 9702491 L 19981228

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-03 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-01-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BILLMAN, AKE

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021119

2002-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TECHNOTRANS AG

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991223

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE