Global Patent Index - EP 0992042 A1

EP 0992042 A1 2000-04-12 - NON-LINEAR RESISTANCE WITH VARISTOR BEHAVIOUR AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (en)

NON-LINEAR RESISTANCE WITH VARISTOR BEHAVIOUR AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (de)

NICHTLINEARER WIDERSTAND MIT VARISTORVERHALTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DIESES WIDERSTANDS

Title (fr)

RESISTANCE NON LINEAIRE A COMPORTEMENT DE VARISTOR ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE CETTE RESISTANCE

Publication

EP 0992042 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99915429 A

Priority

  • CH 9900165 W
  • DE 19824104 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19824104A1] The nonlinear resistor includes a sintered varistor granulate filler embedded in a matrix. The granulate is mainly crystalline, spherical particles made of metal oxide, separated from each other by grain boundaries. The filler also includes geometrically anisotropic conductive particles which cover part of the surface of the spherical particles. Also, the varistor granulate may contain two fractions of particles of different sizes, one fraction being of greater diameter than the other, and arranged tightly so that particles of the second fraction fill the holes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01C 7/112; H01C 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01C 7/10 (2006.01); H01C 7/112 (2006.01); H01C 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01C 7/12 (2013.01); H01C 7/112 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9956290A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19824104 A1 19991028; DE 19824104 B4 20091224; AT 303652 T 20050915; AU 3404399 A 19991116; AU 751978 B2 20020905; CN 1145981 C 20040414; CN 1266534 A 20000913; DE 59912488 D1 20051006; EP 0992042 A1 20000412; EP 0992042 B1 20050831; JP 2002506578 A 20020226; JP 4921623 B2 20120425; PL 190068 B1 20051031; PL 337696 A1 20000828; US 6469611 B1 20021022; WO 9956290 A1 19991104

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160423

2016-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150430

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-08-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2005-10-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912488 P 20051006

2005-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2005-08-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040609

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991202

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT