Global Patent Index - EP 0992043 A1

EP 0992043 A1 2000-04-12 - COIL WINDER AND COIL WINDING METHOD

Title (en)

COIL WINDER AND COIL WINDING METHOD

Title (de)

SPULENWICKELVORRICHTUNG UND SPULENWICKELVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

BOBINEUR ET PROCEDE DE BOBINAGE

Publication

EP 0992043 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98910972 A

Priority

JP 9801295 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9949482A1] A coil winder wherein a wire (A) is put in a condition in which it is in contact with a winding core member (13), and this wire is wound around the surface of the winding core member by means of a pair of winding tools (R, S) which hold this wire from both sides with a contact pressure force which plastically deforms this wire, and by rotating either one of the winding tools.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 41/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 41/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 41/077 (2016.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9949482A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9949482 A1 19990930; DE 69823999 D1 20040624; DE 69823999 T2 20050407; EP 0992043 A1 20000412; EP 0992043 B1 20040519; EP 0992043 B9 20040908; JP 2001500673 A 20010116; JP 3345024 B2 20021118

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100325

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090326

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090330

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050325

2005-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050222

2005-03-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050325

2004-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69823999

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2004-05-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030122

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991207

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT