Global Patent Index - EP 0992046 A2

EP 0992046 A2 2000-04-12 - LOW-VOLTAGE POWER SWITCH WITH AN ACTUATING SHAFT

Title (en)

LOW-VOLTAGE POWER SWITCH WITH AN ACTUATING SHAFT

Title (de)

NIEDERSPANNUNGS-LEISTUNGSSCHALTER MIT EINER SCHALTWELLE

Title (fr)

INTERRUPTEUR DE PUISSANCE BASSE TENSION COMPORTANT UN ARBRE DE COMMUTATION

Publication

EP 0992046 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98934772 A

Priority

  • DE 9801406 W
  • DE 19727853 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19727853C1] The invention relates to a low-voltage power switch with an actuating shaft for actuating switching contacts. The actuating shaft consists of a centre shaft with radially extending levers which can be connected to switching contacts or a drive unit. At least one section of the centre shaft (2) and one part of the levers (3) are produced as a single-piece actuating shaft unit according to a metal casting process. Preferably, the pressure casting process involves the use of aluminium or zinc alloys.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 31/02 (2006.01); H01H 3/46 (2006.01); H01H 33/02 (2006.01); H01H 33/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/022 (2013.01); H01H 3/46 (2013.01); H01H 2009/0088 (2013.01); H01H 2009/0094 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9900809A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19727853 C1 19981126; EP 0992046 A2 20000412; EP 0992046 B1 20011219; JP 2002506558 A 20020226; WO 9900809 A2 19990107; WO 9900809 A3 19990415

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-03-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2003-07-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030721

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030528

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802552 20020131

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010516

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991217

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT